WYLIE v. FANNIE MAE
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Quentin Wylie
Defendant: Fannie Mae and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv12089
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Emmanuel Quentin Wylie re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #6 Directing Service by the US Marshal, #7 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge. (SPin)
July 17, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #6 Directing Service by the US Marshal, #7 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Emmanuel Quentin Wylie, 4364 Glendale St., Detroit, MI 48238. (SPin)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Eastern District of Michigan. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 7/2/2019. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/11/2019. (zsb) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Docket Sheet from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-02819. Modified on 7/16/2019 (VLun).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EMMANUEL QUENTIN WYLIE (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 7/16/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT against FANNIE MAE filed by EMMANUEL QUENTIN WYLIE.(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-02819.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WYLIE v. FANNIE MAE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Quentin Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?