Fay v. Saffo Maintenance, Inc
Plaintiff: John W Fay and Janice E Fay
Defendant: Saffo Maintenance, Inc and Sid Saffo
Case Number: 2:2019cv12090
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
2 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
3 Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Mudd Gorman on behalf of Janice E Fay, John W Fay. (Gorman, Joseph)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sid Saffo served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Johnson, Gordon)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Saffo Maintenance, Inc served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Johnson, Gordon)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge George Caram Steeh and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (NAhm)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Sid Saffo* (LGra)
July 18, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Johnson, Gordon)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Johnson, Gordon)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Saffo Maintenance, Inc* (LGra)
July 18, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7323807 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2019-cv-10902, Judge Hon. George Caram Steeh] (Johnson, Gordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fay v. Saffo Maintenance, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W Fay
Represented By: Gordon S. Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Mudd Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice E Fay
Represented By: Gordon S. Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Mudd Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saffo Maintenance, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid Saffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?