Pierson v. Chapman
Plaintiff: Raymond Pierson
Defendant: Willis Chapman
Case Number: 2:2019cv12100
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Christensen-Brown on behalf of Willis Chapman. (Christensen-Brown, Andrea)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Terrence G. Berg and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (NAhm)
July 19, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus and #2 Order requiring responsive pleading on Willis Chapman and the Michigan Attorney General (DPer)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. Response due by 1/23/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DPer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Raymond Pierson against Willis Chapman, Receipt No: 0645-7327660 - Fee: $ 5. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Appendix from Mich Sup Ct Supp Br) (Doman, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2019: #3 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (DPer).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierson v. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?