Schwendimann et al v. Stahls', Inc.,
Plaintiff: Jodi A. Schwendimann and NuCoat, Inc.
Defendant: Stahls', Inc.,
Case Number: 2:2019cv12139
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Stahls', Inc., (Forbis, Glenn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Stahls', Inc.,. (Forbis, Glenn)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER for extension of time to respond to #1 Complaint. Response due by 9/16/2019 Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Glenn E. Forbis appearing on behalf of Stahls', Inc., (Forbis, Glenn)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Stahls', Inc., served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Lund, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Lund, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by NuCoat, Inc. (Lund, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Stahls', Inc.,* (DWor)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Patent Infringement) filed by All Plaintiffs against Stahls', Inc., with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7332455 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-U.S. Patent 6410200, #3 Exhibit B-U.S. Patent 6723773, #4 Exhibit C-CAD-Color Transfer Papers, #5 Exhibit D-CAD-Color Printable Heat Transfer Material) (Lund, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwendimann et al v. Stahls', Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stahls', Inc.,
Represented By: Glenn E. Forbis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi A. Schwendimann
Represented By: Matthew J. Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NuCoat, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?