Williams v. 3DExport et al
Plaintiff: Terrence D. Williams
Defendant: Sketchfab, Inc., Alidropship.com, J C Penny Company, Inc., Turbo Squid, Inc., 3DExport, Original Frame, Wix.com Inc., MindGeek Los Angeles, Wikihow, Inc., Pinterest, Shopify (USA) Inc., Tumblr, Inc. and Patreon, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12240
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by J C Penny Company, Inc. (Responsive Pleading by 10/17/2019). Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by J C Penny Company, Inc.. (King, Stephen)
September 20, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. King on behalf of J C Penny Company, Inc.. (King, Stephen)
September 19, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #29 Order and #30 Order on Terrence D. Williams at 5500 Trumbull Ave., Apt 816, Detroit, MI 48208 (JMcC)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Wikihow, Inc. (Responsive Pleading due by 10/12/2019) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MindGeek Los Angeles. (Responsive Pleading due by 10/3/2019) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 18, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Terrence D. Williams. (NAhm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank T. Mamat on behalf of Wikihow, Inc.. (Mamat, Frank)
September 12, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #23 Order, and #24 Order. Documents Mailed to Terrence D. Williams at 5500 Trumbull Ave., Apt 816, Detroit, MI 48208 (JMcC)
September 12, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Wikihow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Saati, Toufic)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Toufic Saati on behalf of Wikihow, Inc.. (Saati, Toufic)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Patreon, Inc. (Responsive Pleading due by 10/3/2019) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Turbo Squid, Inc. (Responsive Pleading due by 10/4/2019) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #20 Attorney Appearance, #21 Notice (Other) by Pinterest (Willen, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Pinterest Letter to Judge Cox from Brian Willen (Willen, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian Michael Willen appearing on behalf of Pinterest (Willen, Brian)
September 9, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #19 Order on Terrence D. Williams at 5500 Trumbull Ave., Apt 816, Detroit, MI 48208 (JMcC)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Shopify (USA) Inc. (Responsive Pleading due by 10/3/2019) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE: DISQUALIFICATION OF JUDGE and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson to District Judge Sean F. Cox. (NAhm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MindGeek Los Angeles. (Sahu, Saura)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Saura J. Sahu appearing on behalf of MindGeek Los Angeles with limited appearance for MindGeek U.S.A., Inc. (Sahu, Saura)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Turbo Squid, Inc.. (Wassom, Brian)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Patreon, Inc.. (Jugan, Zachary)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Zachary S. Jugan appearing on behalf of Patreon, Inc. (Jugan, Zachary)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph A. Starr appearing on behalf of Patreon, Inc. (Starr, Joseph)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Shopify (USA) Inc.. (LaDue, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. LaDue on behalf of Shopify (USA) Inc.. (LaDue, John)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: DISQUALIFICATION OF JUDGE and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg to District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (NAhm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Dismiss by Wix.com Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form 20-F, #2 Exhibit About Us Page, #3 Exhibit How the world fell in love with man, #4 Exhibit Los Angeles Times Article, #5 Exhibit Renderman Webpage, #6 Exhibit Complaint, #7 Exhibit Order, #8 Exhibit Pictures, #9 Exhibit Naturo-eD-Modelers, #10 Exhibit Naruto-3D-Modelers, #11 Exhibit Terms of Use, #12 Exhibit Deviant Art Terms of Use) (Dukarski, Jennifer)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jennifer A. Dukarski appearing on behalf of Wix.com Inc. (Dukarski, Jennifer)
August 28, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of $400 by Terrence D. Williams - Receipt No. DET124968 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (RBog)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
August 14, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Terrence D. Williams at 5500 Trumbull Ave, Apt 816, Detroit, MI 48208. (AChu)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (Correction due by 8/28/2019) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (SSch)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Terrence D. Williams. (DPer)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Terrence D. Williams against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. 3DExport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sketchfab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alidropship.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C Penny Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen W. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turbo Squid, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Wassom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3DExport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Original Frame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wix.com Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Dukarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MindGeek Los Angeles
Represented By: Saura J. Sahu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wikihow, Inc.
Represented By: Toufic Saati
Represented By: Frank T. Mamat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinterest
Represented By: Brian Michael Willen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shopify (USA) Inc.
Represented By: John D. LaDue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tumblr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patreon, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Starr
Represented By: Zachary S. Jugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?