Yousif v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Waleed K. Yousif
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12344
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER for Second Extension of Time to Respond re #5 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and Sanctions Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1927 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Response due by 10/9/2019 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s #5 Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and Sanctions Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1927 (Response due by 9/25/2019). Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (BSau)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Second Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Pending Resolution of its Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #8 Second MOTION re #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint Pending Resolution of Its Motion for Sanctions (Supplement) (Blalock, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION re #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint Pending Resolution of Its Motion for Sanctions by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Order Granting Second Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint Pending Resolution Of Its Motion For Sanctions) (Blalock, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #5 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and Sanctions Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1927 (AChu)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #5 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and Sanctions Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1927 (AMENDED EXHIBIT 10 ONLY) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 (AMENDED) Essroc Cement Corp v CPRIN) (Hickey, Joseph)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and Sanctions Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1927 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Disposition for Declaratory Judgment Dated May 30, 2019, #3 Exhibit 2 - Temporary Restraining Order, Show Cause Order, and Preliminary Injunction Dated March 9, 2018, #4 Exhibit 3 - Consent Preliminary Injunction Dated March 30, 2018, #5 Exhibit 4 - Wayne County Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Stipulated Order of Dismissal With prejudice and Without Costs Dismissing Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Jessica Sharp, #7 Exhibit 6 - Stipulated Order for Plaintiff to Transfer Money to Pay Bills and Enjoin Defendants from Certain Action dated March 15, 2018, #8 Exhibit 7 - Order for Contempt dated August 8, 2018, #9 Exhibit 8 - Order Denying Motion for Release dated August 24, 2018, #10 Exhibit 9 - Wayne County Litigation Docket, #11 Exhibit 10 - Essroc Cement Corp v. CPRIN, Inc.; 2009 U.S. Dist LEXIS 58718, at *58-59 (W.D. Mich., July 9, 2009), #12 Exhibit 11 - Curtis v. Meijer, Inc., 1987 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 13272, at *9 (E.D. Mich., Apr. 28, 1987), #13 Exhibit 12 - Yousif v. Chase August 7, 2019 Rule 11 Letter) (Blalock, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint filed by Waleed K. Yousif. (Hirschhorn, Austin)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTED TEXT-ONLY ORDER re #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Response due by 9/10/2019) Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Hickey on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hickey, Joseph)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Response due by 8/28/2019) Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Disposition For Declaratory Judgment dated May 30, 2019, #3 Exhibit 2. Temporary Restraining Order, Show Cause Order, and Preliminary Injunction dated March 9, 2018, #4 Exhibit 3. Consent Preliminary Injunction dated March 30, 2018, #5 Exhibit 4. Stipulated Order for Plaintiff to Transfer Money to Pay Bills and Enjoin Defendants from Certain Action dated March 15, 2018, #6 Exhibit 5. Stipulated Order of Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs Dismissing Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Jessica Sharp, #7 Exhibit 6. Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) (Blalock, Michael)
August 7, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 2019-002766-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7354921 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Summons and Complaint) (Blalock, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yousif v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waleed K. Yousif
Represented By: Austin M. Hirschhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael J. Blalock
Represented By: Joseph H. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?