Solomon v. Michigan Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Martin Antonio Solomon
Defendant: Ms. Dunham, Ms. Malloy, Ms. Bradford, Ms. Sindal, Jane/John Doe, Dillay, Ms. Wilson, Ms. Stone, Carol Griffers, Umbarger, W. Alexander, Jeremy Bush, A. Hawkins, Martinez, Diane Russell, Catherine, Michigan Department of Corrections, Lori Poirier, K. Cargor, Crance and M. Hawkins
Case Number: 2:2019cv12354
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION by Martin Antonio Solomon filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (SSch)
October 3, 2019 Filing 28 Memorandum in-law-support of #26 Complaint filed #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining and Preliminary Injunction Order filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (SSch)
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 APPENDIX re: #26 Complaint filed by Martin Antonio Solomon. by Martin Antonio Solomon (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation) (SSch)
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 Supplemental COMPLAINT filed by Martin Antonio Solomon against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation) (SSch)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION in support of good show cause to extend restraining order and other relief filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #19 Notice by Martin Antonio Solomon. (DPer)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION re violation of Court order filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum by Martin Antonio Solomon. (DPer)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION in support of #3 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 APPENDIX by Martin Antonio Solomon (NAhm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE to plaintiff to provide complete names and addresses for defendants. Copy of notice mailed to Martin Antonio Solomon 301631, CHARLES EGELER RECEPTION AND GUIDANCE CENTER ANNEX, 3855 COOPER STREET, JACKSON, MI 49201 (ATee)
September 18, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #18 Order on Motion for TRO on Martin Antonio Solomon Pris. No. 301631 at Charles Egeler Reception and Guidance Center Annex, 3855 Cooper Street, Jackson MI 49201. (Grimes, K.)
September 18, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #18 Order on Motion for TRO on Warden Jeremy Bush at Charles Egeler Reception & Guidance Center Annex, 3855 Cooper St., Jackson MI 49201-7547. (Grimes, K.)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION in support of #3 Motion for temporary restraining order and for preliminary injunction filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION In Support to Join Defendants Through This Supplement Complaint and Declaration In Support for Prohibitary Injunction filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (SOso)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL SEVENTH declaration in support of #3 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 FIFTH DECLARATION in support of #3 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 FIFTH DECLARATION in support of #3 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
August 30, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order on Martin Antonio Solomon Pris. No. 301631 at 3855 Cooper Street, Jackson, MI 49201. (AChu)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Waiving Prepayment of the Filing Fee and Directing Payment of the Initial Partial Filing Fee and Subsequent Payments. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 FOURTH DECLARATION in support of #3 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION in support of #3 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of #3 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction filed by Martin Antonio Solomon. (DPer)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of imminent danger filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of imminent danger filed by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Mediation Program (DAll)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 ADDENDUM re #1 Complaint by Martin Antonio Solomon (DPer)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Martin Antonio Solomon. (DAll) Modified on 8/9/2019 (DAll).
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Martin Antonio Solomon. (DAll)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Martin Antonio Solomon against W. Alexander, Bradford, Jeremy Bush, K. Cargor, Catherine, Crance, Dillay, Jane/John Doe, Dunham, Carol Griffers, A. Hawkins, M. Hawkins, Malloy, Martinez, Michigan Department of Corrections, Lori Poirier, Diane Russell, Sindal, Stone, Umbarger, Wilson (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. Michigan Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Sindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Griffers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Poirier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Cargor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Antonio Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?