Herron v. Polaris Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Teresa Herron
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12357
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Polaris Industries, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (DPer)
September 12, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order Vacating an Order to Show Cause, #11 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Teresa Herron at 16957 Farmington, Livonia, MI 48154. (LBar)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Vacating #7 Order to Show Cause - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by Teresa Herron against Polaris Industries, Inc. (DPer)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Teresa Herron. (DPer)
September 3, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order to Show Cause, #6 Order to Vacate on Teresa Herron at 16957 Farmington, Livonia, MI 48154. (LBar)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Teresa Herron to Show Cause why in writing why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 9/25/2019 - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Vacating #5 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge.R. Steven Whalen - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 27, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Whalen on Teresa Herron at 16957 Farmington, Livonia, MI 48154. (LBar)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Polaris Industries, Inc.* (DPer)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Teresa Herron against Polaris Industries, Inc.; Receipt No: 124588 - Fee: $ 400. (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herron v. Polaris Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?