CAN IV Packard Square LLC v. Packard Square LLC
Plaintiff: CAN IV Packard Square LLC
Defendant: Packard Square LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12359
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
2 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariana Felicia Pellegrino on behalf of CAN IV Packard Square LLC. (Pellegrino, Ariana)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by CAN IV Packard Square LLC. (Dolan, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default as to *Packard Square LLC*. Reason: *Motion to Dismiss filed 09/19/2019* (LGra)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Packard Square LLC. (Demorest, Mark)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Packard Square LLC by CAN IV Packard Square LLC. (Dolan, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Packard Square LLC. (Demorest, Mark)
September 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Packard Square LLC of withdrawal of #3 MOTION to Dismiss . (Demorest, Mark)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CAN IV Packard Square LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Compendium of Unpublished Cases) (Green, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by CAN IV Packard Square LLC against CAN IV Packard Square LLC. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Sheriff's Report of Sale, #3 Exhibit 2 - Sheriff's Deed, #4 Exhibit 3 - Order) (Green, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B. Green on behalf of CAN IV Packard Square LLC. (Green, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by CAN IV Packard Square LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Compendium of Unpublished Cases) (Green, Patrick)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor to District Judge Bernard A. Friedman in Detroit. (SSch)
August 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 MOTION to Dismiss , #2 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #1 Notice of Removal, by Packard Square LLC (Demorest, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 [WITHDRAWN 9/7/2019] MOTION to Dismiss by Packard Square LLC. (Demorest, Mark) Modified on 9/8/2019 (JCur).
August 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants identifying Corporate Parent Packard Square LLC for Packard Square LLC. (Demorest, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Washtenaw County Circuit Court, case number 19-595-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7358460 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court EDM, 2:19-cv-10374, Judge Bernard Friedman] (Demorest, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAN IV Packard Square LLC v. Packard Square LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packard Square LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Demorest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAN IV Packard Square LLC
Represented By: John B. Dolan
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Represented By: Patrick B. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?