CAN IV Packard Square LLC v. Schubiner
Plaintiff: CAN IV Packard Square LLC
Defendant: Craig Schubiner
Case Number: 2:2019cv12360
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
2 Judge: Judith E Levy
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariana Felicia Pellegrino on behalf of CAN IV Packard Square LLC. (Pellegrino, Ariana)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Judith E. Levy and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand in Ann Arbor to District Judge Bernard A. Friedman and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen in Detroit. (SSch)
August 12, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on September 26, 2019 is Cancelled. (SBur)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
August 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, by Craig Schubiner (Demorest, Mark)
August 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Craig Schubiner. (Demorest, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Craig Schubiner from Washtenaw County Circuit Court, case number 19-596-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7358517 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Oakland County Circuit; USDC EDM, 18-167408-CB; 2:19-cv-10374, Judge James Alexander; Bernard Friedman] (Demorest, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAN IV Packard Square LLC v. Schubiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Schubiner
Represented By: Mark S. Demorest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAN IV Packard Square LLC
Represented By: John B. Dolan
Represented By: Ariana Felicia Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?