Scott
Appellant: Laura M. Scott
Case Number: 2:2019cv12397
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Laura M. Scott at 2968 Hanley, Hamtramck, MI 48212. (RLou)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying #7 Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Service re #6 Notice of Appeal. (DPer)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs on appeal by Laura M. Scott. (document titled as a motion) (DPer)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Laura M. Scott re #4 Opinion and order. Fee Status: IFP. (DPer)
September 16, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Opinion and Order, #5 Judgment on Laura M. Scott at 2968 Hanley, Hamtramck, MI 48212. (RLou)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION and ORDER Summarily Dismissing Appeal and Denying Debtor/Appellant's #3 Ex-Parte Emergency Motion to Obtain Relief. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 EX-PARTE emergency motion to obtain relief by Laura M. Scott. (DPer)
August 14, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Documents on Laura M. Scott (VLun)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Laura M. Scott, Bankruptcy Court case number 16-56880. (VLun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Laura M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?