Jones v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: James Brent Jones
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12412
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Response due by 10/24/2019). Issued by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Altman on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Altman, William)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (Defendant's Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint) by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Foley, Erin)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Foley, Erin)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin D. Foley on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Foley, Erin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Furniss, Ryan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Norfolk Southern Railway Company* (DWor)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David B. Timmis appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Timmis, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Q. Houbeck appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Houbeck, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Furniss on behalf of James Brent Jones. (Furniss, Ryan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Brent Jones against Norfolk Southern Railway Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7365944 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Draft Summons) (Furniss, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: William E. Altman
Represented By: Erin D. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brent Jones
Represented By: David B. Timmis
Represented By: David Q. Houbeck
Represented By: Ryan M. Furniss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?