Hewson v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diane Hewson
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS)
Case Number: 2:2019cv12518
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Mountford, Derek)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER Granting Defendants an Extension to File First Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint, (Response due by 10/25/2019) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Mortgage Priority and Dismissal with Prejudice of MERS, with Respect to the August 26, 2009 Mortgage, Only #1 Complaint, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS) terminated. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER Granting Defendants an Extension to File First Responsive Pleadings re; #1 Complaint, Response due by 10/11/2019) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nasseem S. Ramin appearing on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS) (Ramin, Nasseem)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha M. Rich on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS), Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Rich, Trisha)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek K. Mountford on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS), Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Mountford, Derek)
August 27, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC* (SOso)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS)* (SOso)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Diane Hewson against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS), Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7381795 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Douglas. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits) (Hewson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewson v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hewson
Represented By: James F. Hewson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?