R. S. Hanline and Co., Inc. v. Banana Bros. Produce, LLC et al
Plaintiff: R. S. Hanline and Co., Inc.
Defendant: Matthew Gelardi, Banana Bros. Produce, LLC and Chelsey Gelardi
Case Number: 2:2019cv12573
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Notice of Hearing on Motion by R. S. Hanline and Co., Inc. (Nurenberg, Steven)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING on #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants . Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2019 02:30 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman (DTof)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by R. S. Hanline and Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Attorney Steven E. Nurenberg in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #3 Proposed Judgment) (Nurenberg, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Matthew Gelardi* (DAll)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Chelsey Gelardi* (DAll)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Banana Bros. Produce, LLC* (DAll)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Defendants by R. S. Hanline and Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Delcaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Nurenberg, Steven)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Matthew Gelardi served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Nurenberg, Steven)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Chelsey Gelardi served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Nurenberg, Steven)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Banana Bros. Produce, LLC served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Nurenberg, Steven)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Matthew Gelardi* (DWor)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Chelsey Gelardi* (DWor)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Banana Bros. Produce, LLC* (DWor)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by R. S. Hanline and Co., Inc. against Banana Bros. Produce, LLC, Chelsey Gelardi, Matthew Gelardi. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7388155 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Richland, Ohio - County Where Action Arose: Oakland, Michigan - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland, Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices, #2 Exhibit B - Credit Application) (Nurenberg, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. S. Hanline and Co., Inc. v. Banana Bros. Produce, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Gelardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banana Bros. Produce, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsey Gelardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. S. Hanline and Co., Inc.
Represented By: Steven E. Nurenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?