The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan v. Wayne County Muncipal Corporation et al
Petitioner: The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan
Respondent: Wayne County Muncipal Corporation, Eric R. Sabree, Cathy M. Garrett, Raymond J. Wojtowicz and Warren C. Evans
Case Number: 2:2019cv12579
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #21 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan at P.O. BOX 760052, LATHRUP VILLAGE, MI 48076. (EBut)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Requiring Response to #20 Motion to Dismiss,,. Response due by 11/18/2019 Reply due by 12/2/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 Amended MOTION to Dismiss COUNTY CLERK CATHY M. GARRETTS CORRECTED MOTION TO DISMISS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Cathy M. Garrett, Wayne County Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of November 2012 Election Results, #2 Exhibit Wojtowicz Retirement Letter, #3 Exhibit Appointment of Hathaway as Treasurer, #4 Exhibit Hathaway Resignation Letter, #5 Exhibit Appointment of Sabree as Treasurer, #6 Exhibit Sabree Oath April 9, 2016, #7 Exhibit Sabree Affidavit of Identity, #8 Exhibit Certificate of Determination of November 2016 Election Results, #9 Exhibit Sabree Oath June 30, 2017, #10 Exhibit Bsharah v Wayne County Clerk and Wayne County Election Comn) (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTY CLERK CATHY M. GARRETTS BRIEF IN SUPPORT MOTION TO DISMISS by Cathy M. Garrett, Wayne County Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of November 2012 Election Results, #2 Exhibit Wojtowicz Retirement Letter, #3 Exhibit Appointment of Hathaway as Treasurer, #4 Exhibit Hathaway Resignation Letter, #5 Exhibit Appointment of Sabree as Treasurer, #6 Exhibit Sabree Oath April 9, 2016, #7 Exhibit Sabree Affidavit of Identity, #8 Exhibit Certificate of Determination of November 2016 Election Results, #9 Exhibit Sabree Oath June 30, 2017, #10 Exhibit Bsharah v Wayne County Clerk and Wayne County Election Comn) (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
October 24, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #18 Order on The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan at P.O. BOX 760052, LATHRUP VILLAGE, MI 48076. (EBut)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING REPRESENTATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet Anderson-Davis on behalf of Cathy M. Garrett, Wayne County Clerk. (Anderson-Davis, Janet)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cynthia M. Yun appearing on behalf of Wayne County Treasurer Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Yun, Cynthia)[APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENTS] Modified on 10/21/2019 (DPer).
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Blair Yvette Daniels appearing on behalf of Wayne County Treasurer Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Daniels, Blair)[APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENTS] Modified on 10/21/2019 (DPer).
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses WC Respondents' Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Wayne County Treasurer. (Daniels, Blair)
October 9, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation on The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan at c/o Betty Taylor, P.O. Box 760052, Lathrup Village, MI 48076. (EKar)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objection #12 , Accepting Report and Recommendation #11 , and Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #2 . Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #11 Report and Recommendation by The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan. (DPer)
September 18, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan on The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan at P.O. BOX 760052, LATHRUP VILLAGE, MI 48076. (EBut)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued for *Warren C. Evans, Cathy M. Garrett, Eric R. Sabree, Wayne County Clerk, Wayne County Muncipal Corporation, Wayne County Treasurer, Raymond J. Wojtowicz* (SOso)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Warren C. Evans, Cathy M. Garrett, Eric R. Sabree, Wayne County Clerk, Wayne County Muncipal Corporation, Wayne County Treasurer, Raymond J. Wojtowicz* (DPer)
September 6, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of $400 by The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan - Receipt No. DET125157 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (RBog)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 9/11/2019 (SOso)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Ex Parte Emergency Temporary Restraining Order Seeking Injunctive Relief by The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan. (SOso)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION filed by The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan against Warren C. Evans, Cathy M. Garrett, Eric R. Sabree, Wayne County Muncipal Corporation, Raymond J. Wojtowicz (SOso)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan v. Wayne County Muncipal Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Indigenous American People Inhabiting the County of Wayne, Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wayne County Muncipal Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric R. Sabree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cathy M. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raymond J. Wojtowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warren C. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?