Hill v. One Source Provider et al
Plaintiff: Rob Hill
Defendant: One Source Provider and Wassim Elali
Case Number: 2:2019cv12587
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by One Source Provider (Fakih, Samer)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR: DISCOVERY PLAN DUE 11/21/2019; Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2019 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman *READ ENTIRE NOTICE FOR IMPORTANT INFORMATION* (DTof)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Fakih, Samer)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT A: Email from Defendants counsel re ownership of One Source Provider LLC re #5 Memorandum by Rob Hill (Herron, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM re #4 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading Identifying Owners of Defendant One Source Provider by Rob Hill (Herron, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING ROB HILL TO IDENTIFY THE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF ONE SOURCE PROVIDER, LLC Response due by 9/19/2019 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *One Source Provider* (SOso)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Wassim Elali* (SOso)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rob Hill against Rob Hill with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7389850 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: WAYNE - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Herron, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. One Source Provider et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Source Provider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wassim Elali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Hill
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?