Brown,Jr. v. Detroit et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Brown,Jr.
Defendant: Ashley Buchholz, Jordan Leavy and City of Detroit
Case Number: 2:2019cv12592
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ashley Buchholz served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Finegood, Kenneth)
November 1, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE OF TIME AND DATE CHANGE: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 11/6/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 11/13/2019 11:30 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Ashley Buchholz, Jordan Leavy. (Ashu, Alfred)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jordan Leavy served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Finegood, Kenneth)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY To Defendant City of Detroit's Special And Affirmative Defenses by Jerome Brown,Jr.. (Finegood, Kenneth)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. City of Detroit served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Finegood, Kenneth)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by City of Detroit. (Ashu, Alfred)
September 4, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Jordan Leavy* (DWor)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *City of Detroit* (DWor)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ashley Buchholz* (DWor)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND filed by Jerome Brown,Jr. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7391123 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Finegood, Kenneth)
September 4, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Jerome Brown,Jr., Defendant Jordan Leavy. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Finegood, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown,Jr. v. Detroit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Brown,Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth D. Finegood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Buchholz
Represented By: Alfred Ashu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Leavy
Represented By: Alfred Ashu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Detroit
Represented By: Alfred Ashu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?