Multimatic, Inc. v. Edscha Automotive Michigan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Multimatic, Inc.
Defendant: Edscha Automotive Michigan, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12598
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (First Request) by Multimatic, Inc. (Tobin, Brian)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Multimatic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Multimatic Holdings Inc. for Multimatic, Inc.. (Tobin, Brian)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint,, by Multimatic, Inc. (Susser, Steven) Modified on 9/25/2019 (DWor). [DOCUMENT IS A SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED AS TO EDSCHA AUTOMOTIVE MICHIGAN, INC. - SERVICE ON 9/16/19]
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian S. Tobin appearing on behalf of Multimatic, Inc. (Tobin, Brian)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Susser, Steven)
September 5, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Edscha Automotive Michigan, Inc.* (SOso)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Multimatic, Inc. against Edscha Automotive Michigan, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7391767 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ontario, Canada - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - US Patent 10,100,563 B2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Claim Chart for U.S. Patent No. 10,100,563 B2) (Susser, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Multimatic, Inc. v. Edscha Automotive Michigan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edscha Automotive Michigan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multimatic, Inc.
Represented By: Steven C. Susser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?