Scott v. Patel et al
Plaintiff: Laura M. Scott
Defendant: Wayne, County of, K. Angerer, Nandan Patel, Wayne County Land Bank Corporation, Hamtramck, City of, Cynthia Yun, Enterprising Real Estate, LLC, Sabree and R. I. Kilpatrick
Case Number: 2:2019cv12676
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Marianne O Battani
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Strike Def COW, Cynthia Yun and WC Land Bank's Response to Motion to Strike from Motions by Defs' Scandalous and Other Material before Responding to Motions by Defendants filed by Wayne, County of. (Yun, Cynthia)
November 8, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Strike filed by R. I. Kilpatrick, Sabree. (Kilpatrick, Richardo)
November 5, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Set Aside #29 Clerks Entry of Default by K. Angerer. (Surowiec, James)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Referring ALL Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk re #5 Motion, #14 Motion to Dismiss, #41 Motion for Default Judgment, #42 Motion, #12 Motion, #11 Motion to Dismiss, #17 Motion to Strike, #38 Motion to Dismiss, #43 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
November 4, 2019 Filing 43 Ex-Parte MOTION for Default Judgment as to K. Angerer by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 42 Amended Ex-Parte MOTION to Default by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 41 Ex Parte MOTION for Default as to Hamtramck, City of by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default as to *Hamtramck, City of*. Reason: *Motion to Dismiss filed 11/1/2019* (NAhm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hamtramck, City of by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Hamtramck, City of. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Notice of Bankruptcy, #3 Exhibit 2- Adversary Proceeding Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3- Order Denying Motion to Add Parties, #5 Exhibit 4- Order Directing Mediation, #6 Exhibit Motion to Vacate Mediation Order, #7 Exhibit 6- Order Denying Motion to Vacate Order, #8 Exhibit Order Regarding Adversary Hearing, #9 Exhibit Notice of APpeal Regarding Adversary Proceeding, #10 Exhibit 9- Order Denying Application, #11 Exhibit Order Denying Application and Granting Motion to Dismiss, #12 Exhibit 11- Notice of Appeal, #13 Exhibit 12- Corrected Brief of Appellee City of Hamtramck, #14 Exhibit 13-Michigan Court of Appeals Dismissal Order, #15 Exhibit 14- Motion to Re-open Bankruptcy case, #16 Exhibit 15- Order Denying Motion to Reopen, #17 Exhibit 16- Notice of Appeal to District Court, #18 Exhibit Opinion and Order Dismissing Appeal, #19 Exhibit Notice of Appeal to Sixth Circuit) (Surowiec, James)[FILED BY CITY OF HAMTRAMCK AND KATHLEEN ANGERER] Modified on 11/1/2019 (DPer).
November 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Surowiec on behalf of K. Angerer, Hamtramck, City of. (Surowiec, James)
October 29, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Attorney Appearance, #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #15 Response to Motion, by Enterprising Real Estate, LLC and Nandan Patel (Dean, Gregory)
October 29, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default as to *Nandan Patel*. Reason: *Motion to Dismiss filed on 10/25/2019* (NAhm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default as to *Hamtramck, City of*. Reason: *Defendant's answer date is 10/31/2019* (NAhm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *K. Angerer* (NAhm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default as to *R. I. Kilpatrick*. Reason: *Motion to Dismiss filed 10/21/2019* (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laura M. Scott (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nandan Patel by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hamtramck, City of by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to K. Angerer by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to R. I. Kilpatrick by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. R. I. Kilpatrick served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wayne County Land Bank Corporation served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sabree served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Cynthia Yun served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hamtramck, City of served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Enterprising Real Estate, LLC served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nandan Patel served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. K. Angerer served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (NAhm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk. (NAhm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Emergency in Conjunction with Complaint filed by Enterprising Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - MCA Order to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 2 - Email Exchange, #4 Exhibit 3 - Martorana vv FNMA) (Dean, Gregory)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Enterprising Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - MCA Order to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 2 - email exchange, #4 Exhibit Anderson v Wayne, #5 Exhibit Martorana v FNMA) (Dean, Gregory)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory G. Dean appearing on behalf of Enterprising Real Estate, LLC and Nandan Patel (Dean, Gregory)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Motion to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint (requesting emergency status filed by Laura M. Scott against defendants County of Wayne, Cynthia Yun and WC Land Bank by Sabree. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17) (Yun, Cynthia)[FILED BY WAYNE COUNTY, CYNTHIA YUN, AND WAYNE COUNTY LAND BANK] Modified on 10/22/2019 (DPer).
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by R. I. Kilpatrick, Sabree. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Adversary Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Opinion and Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Add Wayne County and Wayne County Treasurer as Parties to this Case, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Order Regarding Plaintiff's Adversary Proceeding and Judgment, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Mptice of Appeal of Order Regarding Plaintiff's Adversary Proceeding to District Court, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Order Denying Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Granting Apellee's Motion to Dismiss and Judgment, #9 Exhibit Notice of Appeal to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Wayne County Treasurer's Motion to Dismiss Appeal, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Michigan Court of Appeals Dismissal Order of Foreclosure Appeal, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Motion to Reopen Bankruptcy Case, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Order Denying Debtor's Motion to Reopen, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Notice of Appeal of Order Denying Debtor's Motion to Reopen to District Court, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Opinion and Order Summarily Dismissing Appeal and Denying Debtor/Appellant's "Ex-Parte Emergency Motion to Obtain Relief" and Judgment, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Notice of Appeal) (Brown, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Referring ALL Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford re #5 Motion. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *K. Angerer, Enterprising Real Estate, LLC, Hamtramck, City of, R. I. Kilpatrick, Nandan Patel, Sabree, Wayne County Land Bank Corporation, Wayne, County of, Cynthia Yun* (DPer)
September 19, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #7 Directing Service by the US Marshal on Laura M. Scott at 2968 Hanley, Hamtramck, Mi 48212-3508 (KDoa)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT COMPLETED SUMMONS AND FORMS TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 9, 2019. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Ex-Parte Emergency MOTION for Relief in Conjunction with Complaint by Laura M. Scott. (NAhm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Laura M. Scott. (DPer)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (requesting emergency status) filed by Laura M. Scott against defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Angerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nandan Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Land Bank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamtramck, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Yun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprising Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. I. Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?