Cataldo et al v. Algonanc, City of
Plaintiff: Philip Cataldo and Loren Lazur
Defendant: Algonanc, City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv12723
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Judgment, #8 Opinion & Order on Philip Cataldo, Loren Lazur, 50636 Jefferson Ave, New Baltimore, MI 48047-2314 (JCur)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION and ORDER granting Defendant's #5 , #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to dismiss filed by Philip Cataldo and Loren Lazur. (DPer) Modified on 11/13/2019 (DPer).
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits Supporting Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: State Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B: State Circuit Court Answer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C: Motion to Withdraw, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D: State Circuit Court Judgment, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E: Affidavit of James T. Downey, Jr.) (Downey, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit State Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Circuit Court Answer, #4 Exhibit Motion to Withdraw, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of James T. Downey, Jr.) (Downey, James)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Philip Cataldo re #3 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (NAhm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Philip Cataldo, Loren Lazur against Algonanc, City of Receipt No: DET 125417 - Fee: $ 400. (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cataldo et al v. Algonanc, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Cataldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Lazur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Algonanc, City of
Represented By: James T. Downey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?