Faulkner et al
Appellant: Isabel Faulkner, Isabel Dhamaraj and Scott Faulkner
Case Number: 2:2019cv12803
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend deadline for appellant to file brief to 1/2/20. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO EXTEND re #4 Scheduling Order for Bankruptcy Appeal by All Plaintiffs. (Conti, Guy)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Appellant Brief due by 11/25/2019 Appellee Brief due by 12/24/2019 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
October 25, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of Receipt of Complete Record on Appeal (VLun)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Designated Bankruptcy Record (VLun)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Isabel Faulkner, Scott Faulkner, Bankruptcy Court case number 19-47676. (VLun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulkner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Isabel Faulkner
Represented By: Guy T. Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Isabel Dhamaraj
Represented By: Guy T. Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Scott Faulkner
Represented By: Guy T. Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?