Miller v. The Bank of New York Mellon, Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, as Trustee for F/B/O Holders of Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc., Bear Sterns Alt-A Trust 05-00010, Mor et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer B. Miller
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, as Trustee for F/B/O Holders of Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc., Bear Sterns Alt-A Trust 2005-10, Mor and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12826
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Darwyn P. Fair re #9 Response to Motion. Per ECF Policies and Procedures Rule 18(b)(3) Exhibits - An Index of Exhibits Must be Attached and Each Exhibit Must be Individually Attached AND Named. Document #9 was Stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (KWin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 [STRICKEN PER ERROR NOTICE] RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Exhibits filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit) (Fair, Darwyn) Modified on 11/25/2019 (KWin).
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fair, Darwyn)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Accepting in Part Joint Stipulation Extending Plaintiff's Deadline to File a Response to Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss. ( Response due by 11/22/2019.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING on #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A. Mortgage, #3 Exhibit B. Assignment of Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C. Notice of Default, #5 Exhibit D. Sheriff's Deed, #6 Exhibit E. Unpublished Opinions, #7 Exhibit F. QWR Response, #8 Exhibit G. Denial Letter) (Dell, David)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Accepting Proposed Stipulated Order in Part and Extending Deadline to File First Responsive Pleading. (Defendants' Response due by 10/18/2019) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SGam)
September 30, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Baucus on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, as Trustee for F/B/O Holders of Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc., Bear Sterns Alt-A Trust 2005-10, Mor. (Baucus, Laura)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by All Defendants (Dell, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Midland County Circuit Court, case number 19-6464-CH-C. Receipt No: 0645-7422662 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A. Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B. Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C. Assignment, #5 Exhibit D. SEV) (Dell, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. The Bank of New York Mellon, Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, as Trustee for F/B/O Holders of Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc., Bear Sterns Alt-A Trust 05-00010, Mor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, as Trustee for F/B/O Holders of Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc., Bear Sterns Alt-A Trust 2005-10, Mor
Represented By: David M. Dell
Represented By: Laura Baucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Dell
Represented By: Laura Baucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?