Prescription Supply Inc v. Welcome Pharmacies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Prescription Supply Inc
Defendant: Welcome Pharmacies, Inc., Commet Welcome Pharmacies, Inc., Daycom Investments, L.L.C., Ro-Lyn Investments, L.L.C. and Robert Paul Commet
Not Yet Classified: Basil T. Simon
Case Number: 2:2019cv12938
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 Receiver BOND in the amount of $ $225,000.00 posted by Basil T. Simon (Stella, Stephen)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Stella on behalf of Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
October 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/28/2019. (MLan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver. Response due by 10/25/2019. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2019 01:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) Modified on 10/28/2019 (MLan).
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Jason Cardasis on behalf of All Defendants. (Cardasis, Christopher)
October 16, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Notice to Appear on Robert Paul Commet at email to rxrpc@yahoo.com. (MLan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 10/17/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Welcome Pharmacies, Inc. served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Cooper, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Commet Welcome Pharmacies, Inc. served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Cooper, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ro-Lyn Investments, L.L.C. served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Cooper, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Daycom Investments, L.L.C. served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Cooper, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Robert Paul Commet served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Cooper, David)
October 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Telephonic Status Conference continued on 10/9/2019. (MLan)
October 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/9/2019. (MLan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Benjamin Z. Heywood appearing on behalf of Prescription Supply Inc (Heywood, Benjamin)
October 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Prescription Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Rebekah Smith) (Cooper, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Prescription Supply Inc. (Cooper, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Prescription Supply Inc (Cooper, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint filed by Prescription Supply Inc against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7436244 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wood, Ohio - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson, Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States Bankruptcy Court, Eastern District of Michigan, 12-53620, 12-53636, 12-53639, 12-53646, 12-53653, 12-53658, Judge Thomas Tucker] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Note, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Supply Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Jackson Mortgage, #5 Exhibit Ex. E Michigan Center Mortgage, #6 Exhibit Ex. F Collateral Assignment of Lease, #7 Exhibit Ex. G UCC Financing Statements, #8 Exhibit Ex. H PMSI Notifications, #9 Exhibit Ex. I Account Control Agreement) (Cooper, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prescription Supply Inc v. Welcome Pharmacies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welcome Pharmacies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Jason Cardasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commet Welcome Pharmacies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Jason Cardasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daycom Investments, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher Jason Cardasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ro-Lyn Investments, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher Jason Cardasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Paul Commet
Represented By: Christopher Jason Cardasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prescription Supply Inc
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Represented By: Benjamin Z. Heywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Basil T. Simon
Represented By: Stephen P. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?