Tatarian et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Tatarian and David Tatarian
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Weber & Olcese, P.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12983
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Marianne O Battani
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Rheaume, Thomas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Rheaume, Thomas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charity A. Olson on behalf of Weber & Olcese, P.L.C.. (Olson, Charity)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bank of America, N.A. served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Kruzyk, Alexander)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Weber & Olcese, P.L.C. served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Kruzyk, Alexander)
October 11, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Weber & Olcese, P.L.C.* (DAll)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Bank of America, N.A.* (DAll)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald S. Weiss appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weiss, Ronald)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Tatarian, Mary Tatarian against Bank of America, N.A., Weber & Olcese, P.L.C. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7439833 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Consent Judgments, #3 Exhibit B - 1099-C Forms, #4 Exhibit C - Letters from Weber & Olcese, P.L.C., #5 Exhibit D - Request and Writ for Garnishment, #6 Exhibit E - Garnishee Disclosure, #7 Exhibit F - Dispute Letter) (Kruzyk, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatarian et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber & Olcese, P.L.C.
Represented By: Charity A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tatarian
Represented By: Ronald S. Weiss
Represented By: Alexander D. Kruzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tatarian
Represented By: Ronald S. Weiss
Represented By: Alexander D. Kruzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?