Joseph et al v. Jahwary et al
Plaintiff: Hotel Furniture Liquidators Inc., Parking Lot Service Inc., May Joseph and Fadi Essa
Defendant: Tanya Klatt, Nevar Jahwary and Yousif Damman
Case Number: 2:2019cv12993
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING on #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2020 @ 2:00 PM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds (LBar)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Yousif Damman, Nevar Jahwary, Tanya Klatt. (Mychalowych, Andrew)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER, (Responsive Pleading due by 12/5/2019) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Yousif Damman served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019; Nevar Jahwary served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Tanya Klatt served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Desai, Shawn)
October 15, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Tanya Klatt* (DAll)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Nevar Jahwary* (DAll)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Yousif Damman* (DAll)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hotel Furniture Liquidators Inc., May Joseph, Parking Lot Service Inc., Fadi Essa against Yousif Damman, Nevar Jahwary, Tanya Klatt. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7440418 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Intended Use of Wire Routing, #3 Exhibit 2 - 150000 Transfer, #4 Exhibit 3- West Coast Entity Summary, #5 Exhibit 4 - West Coast Purchase Agreement, #6 Exhibit 5 - WC Bank of America Records, #7 Exhibit 6 - Tanya Klatt West Coast Application, #8 Exhibit 7- Record of 50000 Wire Transfer, #9 Exhibit 8 - Hector Text Messages, #10 Exhibit 9 - Wire Transfer from West Coast, #11 Exhibit Promissory Note Amendment, #12 Exhibit 11-Ferndale Loding Account Records, #13 Exhibit 12 - Yousif Damman Affadavit, #14 Exhibit 13- Evidence of Continuing Criminal Enterprise, #15 Exhibit 14- Email Representations) (Desai, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph et al v. Jahwary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hotel Furniture Liquidators Inc.
Represented By: Shawn Lowe Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parking Lot Service Inc.
Represented By: Shawn Lowe Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: May Joseph
Represented By: Shawn Lowe Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fadi Essa
Represented By: Shawn Lowe Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Klatt
Represented By: Andrew W. Mychalowych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevar Jahwary
Represented By: Andrew W. Mychalowych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yousif Damman
Represented By: Andrew W. Mychalowych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?