Esson v. Village of Milford et al
Plaintiff: Michael Esson
Defendant: Robert Calley and Village of Milford
Case Number: 2:2019cv13016
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/1/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III, Jury Trial set for 2/9/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DPar)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/2/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. (DPar)
December 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 12/10/2019. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (DPar)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Batey, Scott)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Forbush, Audrey)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Robert Calley served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Batey, Scott)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Village of Milford served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Batey, Scott)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey J. Forbush on behalf of All Defendants. (Forbush, Audrey)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Robert Calley* (SOso)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Village of Milford* (SOso)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Esson against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7442816 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Shiawassee - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Batey, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esson v. Village of Milford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Calley
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Milford
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Esson
Represented By: Scott P. Batey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?