Rose v. Oakland County Treasurer et al
Plaintiff: Sharron Rose
Defendant: Oakland County Treasurer, +City of Southfield and Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13066
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Knoblock on behalf of City of Southfield. (Knoblock, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Joseph Seward on behalf of City of Southfield. (Seward, T.)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING on #15 MOTION to Dismiss, and #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 at 3:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC. (Nicols, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 MOTION to Dismiss by Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC (Nicols, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit) (Nicols, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 at 3:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Dismissing #5 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sharron Rose (Borman, Gilbert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued for *City of Southfield* (DAll)
November 12, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for City of Southfield. (Borman, Gilbert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sharron Rose (Borman, Gilbert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G. Couvreur on behalf of Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC. (Couvreur, Joseph)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Nicols on behalf of Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC. (Nicols, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400 by Sharron Rose - Receipt No. DET126633 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (RBog)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 11/11/2019. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Oakland County Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint-Oakland Circuit, #3 Exhibit B-Motion to Dismiss-Oakland Circuit, #4 Exhibit C-Opinion and Order, #5 Exhibit D-Order of Court of Appeals, #6 Exhibit E-Email, #7 Exhibit F-Zerod v. Caprathe, #8 Exhibit G-Caesarea v. DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., #9 Exhibit H-Rafaeli, LLC v. Wayne County, #10 Exhibit I-Talbot v.U.S. Bank) (Horton, William)
October 18, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 10/25/2019 (LGra)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Sharron Rose against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Document Continuation Coversheet) (Borman, Gilbert)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sharron Rose against All Defendants. No summons requested. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: Michigan Court of Appeals, 346309, Judge Bench] [Possible companion case(s): 46th District Court, LT 19-4614, Judge Nance] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit) (Borman, Gilbert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Oakland County Treasurer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County Treasurer
Represented By: William H. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: +City of Southfield
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative LLC
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Represented By: Matthew T. Nicols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharron Rose
Represented By: Gilbert Borman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?