ROBINSON v. QUICKEN LOANS INC
Plaintiff: CHRYSTAL ROBINSON
Defendant: QUICKEN LOANS INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13129
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. QUICKEN LOANS INC waiver sent on 10/25/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Aikens, Carla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Kolkmeyer on behalf of QUICKEN LOANS INC. (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Cashen on behalf of QUICKEN LOANS INC. (Cashen, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's State Law Claims - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *QUICKEN LOANS INC* (DPer)
October 25, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by CHRYSTAL ROBINSON against QUICKEN LOANS INC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7459377 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: MACOMB - County Where Action Arose: WAYNE - County of 1st Defendant: WAYNE. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Aikens, Carla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBINSON v. QUICKEN LOANS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUICKEN LOANS INC
Represented By: Michelle L. Kolkmeyer
Represented By: John C. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRYSTAL ROBINSON
Represented By: Carla D. Aikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?