McCord v. American Modern Home Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Estine McCord
Defendant: American Modern Home Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv13191
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/26/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/27/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MVer)
November 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Status Conference held on 11/25/2019 (MVer)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 11/25/2019 10:30 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by American Modern Home Insurance Company. (Seibert, Kimberly)
November 1, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400 by American Modern Home Insurance Company - Receipt No. DET126421 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (RBog)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Modern Home Insurance Company (Corrected) from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 2019-010691-nf. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. [Previously dismissed case: Oakland County Circuit Court, 18-170631-NF, Judge Cheryl Matthews] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process) (Seibert, Kimberly)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE of error directed to: Kimberly K. Seibert re #1 Notice of Removal. A copy of the state court complaint was not attached to the notice of removal. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DPer)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 11/6/2019 (DPer)
October 30, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Modern Home Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-010691-NF. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. [Previously dismissed case: Oakland County Circuit Court, 18-170631-NF, Judge Cheryl Matthews] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Seibert, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCord v. American Modern Home Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estine McCord
Represented By: Alan Lamar Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Modern Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly K. Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?