Ford v. Jindal et al
Plaintiff: William J. Ford
Defendant: Janak R Bhavsar, Michigan Dept of Corrections, Rosilyn Jindal and Judy Crisenbery
Case Number: 2:2019cv13207
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #14 Order Rescheduling Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference on William J. Ford Pris. No. 516929 at Gus Harrison Correctional Facility, 2727 E. Beecher Street, Adrian, MI 49221. (KCas)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Rescheduling Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
December 17, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Order Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference on William J. Ford Pris. No. 516929 at Gus Harrison Correctional Facility, 2727 E. Beecher Street, Adrian, MI 49221. (KCas)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Allan J. Soros on behalf of Judy Crisenbery, Michigan Dept of Corrections for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Soros, Allan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Wedad Ibrahim on behalf of Janak R Bhavsar, Rosilyn Jindal for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Ibrahim, Wedad)
November 22, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order Staying Case on William J. Ford Pris. No. 516929 at 2727 E. Beecher Street, Adrian, MI 49221. (LBar)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
November 20, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on William J. Ford (AFla)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $36.00 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (AFla)
November 20, 2019 Deficiency Corrected re #4 Order to Correct Deficiency (Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only), #3 Order to Correct Deficiency (Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only). (AFla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 ADDENDUM to #1 Complaint by William J. Ford (DPer)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by William J. Ford. (DPer)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Document filed by William J. Ford. (NAhm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit 4 additional copies. Correction due by 12/2/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (LGra)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 12/2/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (LGra)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William J. Ford (LGra)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by William J. Ford against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (LGra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Jindal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janak R Bhavsar
Represented By: Wedad Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Dept of Corrections
Represented By: Allan J. Soros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosilyn Jindal
Represented By: Wedad Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Crisenbery
Represented By: Allan J. Soros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?