Kennedy v. Stewart et al
Plaintiff: David J. Kennedy
Defendant: Sgt. Mask, Lt. Curtis, Kevin Lindsey and Anthony H. Stewart
Case Number: 2:2019cv13210
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Allan J. Soros on behalf of Lt. Curtis for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Soros, Allan)
November 14, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Staying Case and #5 Opinion and Order of Partial Dismissal on David J. Kennedy 465403, G. ROBERT COTTON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 3500 N. ELM ROAD, JACKSON, MI 49201 (JMcC)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER of Partial Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $119.00 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (AFla)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by David J. Kennedy. (LGra)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David J. Kennedy against All Defendants (LGra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Mask
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Curtis
Represented By: Allan J. Soros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony H. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?