Walbridge Industrial Process, LLC v. Gray & Becker Construction Services LP
Plaintiff: Walbridge Industrial Process, LLC
Defendant: Gray & Becker Construction Services LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv13271
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Walbridge Industrial Process, LLC against Gray & Becker Construction Services LP. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Gray and Becker Website, #3 Exhibit B - Subcontract) (Gould, Seth)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Walbridge Industrial Process, LLC to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 12/31/2019. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Gray & Becker Construction Services LP* (LGra)
November 7, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Walbridge Industrial Process, LLC against Gray & Becker Construction Services LP. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7476275 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Gray & Becker Construction Dated 08-15-2017) (Gould, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walbridge Industrial Process, LLC v. Gray & Becker Construction Services LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walbridge Industrial Process, LLC
Represented By: Seth D. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray & Becker Construction Services LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?