Ford v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Johnette Ford
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv13288
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 12:30 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Sawyer, Elaine)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Affirmative Defenses, #2 Document Continuation Reliance on Jury Demand) (Sawyer, Elaine)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine M. Sawyer on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Sawyer, Elaine)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
November 8, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: James F. Hewson re #1 Notice of Removal,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-013012-NF. Receipt No: 0645-7478656 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2:04-cv-72335, Judge Anna Diggs Taylor] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hewson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James F. Hewson
Represented By: Elaine M. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnette Ford
Represented By: Michael J. Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?