Cole v. Buckner
Plaintiff: Steven J. Cole, II
Defendant: Scott Buckner
Case Number: 2:2019cv13299
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference on Steven J. Cole, II Pris. No. 437674 at Marquette Branch Prison, 1960 U.S. Hwy 41 South, Marquette, MI 49855. (KCas)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of authorization for release of information by Steven J. Cole, II (DPer)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
November 14, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order Staying Case, on Steven J. Cole, II Pris. No. 437674 at 1960 U.S. Hwy 41 South, Marquette, MI 49855. (RLou)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $23.54 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (KBro)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Steven J. Cole, II. (AFla)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Steven J. Cole, II against Steven J. Cole, II (AFla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Cole, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?