Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. v. JTEKT Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Defendant: JTEKT North America Corporation, JTEKT Corporation, NTN USA Corporation, NTN Corporation, NSK Ltd., KOYO Bearings North America, LLC and NSK Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13302
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Marianne O Battani
Referring Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
2 Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Ettinger on behalf of NSK Americas, Inc.. (Ettinger, David)
January 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Vanek on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Vanek, Joseph)
January 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Akkashian on behalf of JTEKT North America Corporation, KOYO Bearings North America, LLC. (Akkashian, Brian)
December 30, 2019 Filing 25 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by NSK Americas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NSK Ltd. for NSK Americas, Inc.. (Calsyn, Jeremy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Kaiser on behalf of NSK Americas, Inc.. (Kaiser, Steven)
December 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Lawrence Malm on behalf of NSK Americas, Inc.. (Malm, Carl)
December 30, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy J. Calsyn on behalf of NSK Americas, Inc.. (Calsyn, Jeremy)
December 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Palfin on behalf of JTEKT North America Corporation, KOYO Bearings North America, LLC. (Palfin, Keith)
December 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather P. Lamberg on behalf of JTEKT North America Corporation, KOYO Bearings North America, LLC. (Lamberg, Heather)
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Amato on behalf of NTN USA Corporation. (Amato, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Donovan on behalf of NTN USA Corporation. (Donovan, Molly)
December 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Paul Victor on behalf of NTN USA Corporation. (Victor, A.)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Kessler on behalf of NTN USA Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. NTN USA Corporation waiver sent on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Parks, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. KOYO Bearings North America, LLC waiver sent on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Parks, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. JTEKT North America Corporation waiver sent on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Parks, James)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Parks, James)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Matthew F. Leitman in Flint to District Judge Marianne O. Battani in Detroit. (NAhm)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued for *NTN USA Corporation* (RBog)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued for *NTN Corporation* (RBog)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *NSK Ltd.* (RBog)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *NSK Americas, Inc.* (RBog)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *KOYO Bearings North America, LLC* (RBog)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *JTEKT North America Corporation* (RBog)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *JTEKT Corporation* (RBog)
November 14, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400.00 by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. - Receipt No. DET126691 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (RBog)
November 13, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Filing fee is $400 Correction due by 11/20/2019 (LGra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. , Receipt No: 0645-7480246 - Fee: 47 dollars. (Parks, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: WAYNE - County Where Action Arose: WAYNE - County of 1st Defendant: WAYNE. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Parks, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. v. JTEKT Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Parks
Represented By: Joseph M. Vanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JTEKT North America Corporation
Represented By: Keith Palfin
Represented By: Heather P. Lamberg
Represented By: Brian M. Akkashian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JTEKT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTN USA Corporation
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: A. Paul Victor
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTN Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSK Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOYO Bearings North America, LLC
Represented By: Keith Palfin
Represented By: Heather P. Lamberg
Represented By: Brian M. Akkashian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSK Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Kaiser
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Malm
Represented By: Jeremy J. Calsyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?