umlaut, Inc. v. P3 USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: umlaut, Inc.
Defendant: P3 USA, Inc., Walter Kaufmann, Maren Boehmer and Chris Heiler
Case Number: 2:2019cv13310
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Maren Boehmer waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; Chris Heiler waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; Walter Kaufmann waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; P3 USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Spangler, Cardelle)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Rescinding #7 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
December 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 1/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
November 13, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *P3 USA, Inc.* (DAll)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Walter Kaufmann* (DAll)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Chris Heiler* (DAll)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Maren Boehmer* (DAll)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by umlaut, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent umlaut AG for umlaut, Inc.. (Spangler, Cardelle)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Other Relief filed by umlaut, Inc. against Maren Boehmer, Chris Heiler, Walter Kaufmann, P3 USA, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7480743 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Spangler, Cardelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: umlaut, Inc. v. P3 USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P3 USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maren Boehmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Heiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: umlaut, Inc.
Represented By: Cardelle B. Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?