Ranke v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Ruben Ranke
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer, Kym L. Worthy, John A. McColgan and Dana Nessel
Case Number: 2:2019cv13332
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Dismissal of Defendants Whitmer, Nessel, and Worthy without prejudice on Ruben Ranke at 8333 Townsend, Detroit, MI 48213 (DWor)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Dismissal of Defendants Whitmer, Nessel, and Worthy without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk. (DWor)
January 7, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #16 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Ruben Ranke at 8333 Townsend, Detroit, MI 48213 (DWor)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Requiring Response to #15 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 1/24/2020. Reply due by 2/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk. (DWor)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Ruben Ranke. (NAhm)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by John A. McColgan. (Ferrand, Timothy)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Ferrand on behalf of John A. McColgan. (Ferrand, Timothy)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 PETITION for appointment of counsel by Ruben Ranke. (DPer)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph T. Froehlich appearing on behalf of Dana Nessel, Gretchen Whitmer with Certificate of Service (Froehlich, Joseph)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Dana Nessel waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Froehlich, Joseph)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Gretchen Whitmer waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Froehlich, Joseph)
November 21, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Ruben Ranke at 8333 Townsend, Detroit, MI 48213. (McColley, N)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (McColley, N)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing service without prepayment of costs and authorizing the US Marshal to collect costs after service is made. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (AFla)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (AFla)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (KBro)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Ruben Ranke. (KBro)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ruben Ranke against All Defendants (KBro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ranke v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Ranke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kym L. Worthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. McColgan
Represented By: Timothy S. Ferrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?