Garcia v. Genisys Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Hilary Garcia
Defendant: Genisys Credit Union and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 2:2019cv13430
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Jo Kirk on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kirk, Emily)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. McCune on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McCune, Richard)
December 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Time for Genisys Credit Union to Respond to The Complaint. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael V. Krempa on behalf of Genisys Credit Union. (Krempa, Michael)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Holzman on behalf of Genisys Credit Union. (Holzman, Charles)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Genisys Credit Union served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Goodman, Philip)
November 21, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Genisys Credit Union* (DAll)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hilary Garcia against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7494545 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Goodman, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Genisys Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Garcia
Represented By: Philip J. Goodman
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Represented By: Richard D. McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genisys Credit Union
Represented By: Charles Holzman
Represented By: Michael V. Krempa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?