Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv13473
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
2 Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker to District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (NAhm)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Darling on behalf of Internal Revenue Service. (Darling, Bradley)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Internal Revenue Service served on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Adams, Anthony)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores served on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Adams, Anthony)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Internal Revenue Service* (LGra)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (LGra)
November 26, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores against Internal Revenue Service. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7499107 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: MACOMB - County Where Action Arose: MACOMB - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District, 19-11954, Judge Judith Levy] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit) (Adams, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores
Represented By: Anthony Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Bradley Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?