Premier Staff Services, Inc. et al v. World Business Lenders
Plaintiff: Olu Victor Longe, Omobolaji Celina Longe and Premier Staff Services, Inc.
Defendant: World Business Lenders
Case Number: 2:2019cv13529
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Motion is due 1/20/2020. (Plaintiff's Response to #2 Motion to Dismiss is due 1/27/2020, Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion is due 2/10/2020, Hearing (if necessary) on Motions will be held 3/2/2020 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Status Conference held on 1/6/2020. (MLan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by All Plaintiffs. (Fair, Darwyn)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #1 Notice of Removal, by All Plaintiffs. (Fair, Darwyn)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2020 11:30 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by World Business Lenders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Teicher, Julie)
November 27, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-014238-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7504617 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Part 1, #2 Exhibit A-Part 2, #3 Exhibit B) (Teicher, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premier Staff Services, Inc. et al v. World Business Lenders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Business Lenders
Represented By: Julie B. Teicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olu Victor Longe
Represented By: Darwyn P. Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omobolaji Celina Longe
Represented By: Darwyn P. Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Staff Services, Inc.
Represented By: Darwyn P. Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?