Bringold v. Allstate Vehhicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ryan Bringold
Defendant: Allstate Vehhicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv13545
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/8/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/8/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MLan)
January 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Scheduling Conference held on 1/8/2020. (MLan)
January 6, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference RE-SET TO 1/8/2020 11:30 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 6, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling/Settlement Conference ADJOURNED TO 1/13/2020 03:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 1/8/2020 11:30 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
December 3, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehhicle and Property Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-013986 CK. Receipt No: 0645-7507039 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 19-013986 CK, Judge David Groner] (Dunlap, Rod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bringold v. Allstate Vehhicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehhicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Rod A. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Bringold
Represented By: Marc A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?