Franklin Capital Funding, LLC v. AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite
Plaintiff: Franklin Capital Funding, LLC
Defendant: AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite
Case Number: 2:2019cv13562
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING on #9 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel , #7 MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support of Motion, Certificate of Service. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2020 at 3:30 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response re #7 MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support of Motion, Certificate of Service filed by AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite. (Kaminski, Shanna)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response re #9 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Franklin Capital Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Behrendt, John)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support of Motion, Certificate of Service filed by Franklin Capital Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Behrendt, John)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Kaminski, Shanna)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite identifying Corporate Parent AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite for AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite. (Kaminski, Shanna)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Franklin Capital Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Brief, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G) (Behrendt, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Franklin Capital Funding, LLC (Behrendt, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support of Motion, Certificate of Service by AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite. (Kaminski, Shanna)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Date by Which Defendant May Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,, ( Response due by 1/9/2020) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanna M. Kaminski on behalf of AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite. (Kaminski, Shanna)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION extending date by which Defendant may Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Franklin Capital Funding, LLC (Behrendt, John)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Benton Moore on behalf of Franklin Capital Funding, LLC. (Moore, Melissa)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Behrendt on behalf of Franklin Capital Funding, LLC. (Behrendt, John)
December 4, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite from Oakland Circuit, case number 19-177717-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7508641 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Kaminski, Shanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin Capital Funding, LLC v. AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKF, Inc. d/b/a FundKite
Represented By: Shanna M. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Capital Funding, LLC
Represented By: John A. Behrendt
Represented By: Melissa Benton Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?