FTF Lending, LLC v. CWF Charter Financial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FTF Lending, LLC
Defendant: Treasurer of Oakland County, Michigan, Ali A. Shebley, CWF Charter Financial, LLC, United States of America and Occupant(s) or Tenant(s) of 1250 Emmons Avenue, Birmingham, Michigan 48009
Case Number: 2:2019cv13605
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by FTF Lending, LLC (Gingo, Anthony)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Dismiss Defendant, United States of America, Only, and to Index and Record Extinguishment of Federal Tax Liens Against Subject Property. United States of America terminated. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tauras N. Ziedas on behalf of United States of America. (Ziedas, Tauras)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Treasurer of Oakland County as a Party Defendant. Treasurer of Oakland County, Michigan terminated. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Answer to Complaint by Treasurer of Oakland County, Michigan (Mann, William)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Treasurer of Oakland County, Michigan. (Mann, William)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
December 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FTF Lending, LLC (Gingo, Anthony)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) Breach of Promissory Note, (2) Breach of Guaranty, (3) Foreclosure of Mortgage, and (4) Foreclosure of Assignment of Leases and Rents [1250 Emmons Avenue, Birmingham, Michigan 48009 (Parcel ID #20-31-353-007)] filed by FTF Lending, LLC against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7516392 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - Guaranty, #4 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D - Assignment of Leases and Rents, #6 Exhibit E - Vesting Deed, #7 Exhibit F - Notice of Default, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Federal Tax Liens, #9 Exhibit H - Civil Cover Sheet) (Gingo, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FTF Lending, LLC v. CWF Charter Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer of Oakland County, Michigan
Represented By: William J. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali A. Shebley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWF Charter Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tauras N. Ziedas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupant(s) or Tenant(s) of 1250 Emmons Avenue, Birmingham, Michigan 48009
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FTF Lending, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Gingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?