Uselmann et al v. Pop et al
Plaintiff: Ion Gutu, Mirela Uselmann, Gabriel Biclea and Dumitru Marius Rendenciuc
Defendant: Maria Pop, NA Truck Repair LLC, R.S.P Express Inc and Razvan S Pop
Case Number: 2:2019cv13652
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING on #10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Brief, #2 Index of Exhibits Index, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Carey, Raymond)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by All Defendants of withdrawal of #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Carey, Raymond)
January 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by NA Truck Repair LLC, Maria Pop, Razvan S Pop, R.S.P Express Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Carey, Raymond)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Carey, Raymond)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. R.S.P Express Inc served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Miller, Bruce)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. NA Truck Repair LLC served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Miller, Bruce)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Razvan S Pop served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Miller, Bruce)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Maria Pop served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Miller, Bruce)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
December 12, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7521760 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Miller, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uselmann et al v. Pop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ion Gutu
Represented By: Bruce A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirela Uselmann
Represented By: Bruce A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Biclea
Represented By: Bruce A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dumitru Marius Rendenciuc
Represented By: Bruce A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Pop
Represented By: Raymond J. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NA Truck Repair LLC
Represented By: Raymond J. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.S.P Express Inc
Represented By: Raymond J. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razvan S Pop
Represented By: Raymond J. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?