Silver Phoenix, LLC v. Trinity Health-Michigan D/B/A St. Joseph Mercy Oakland
Plaintiff: Silver Phoenix, LLC
Defendant: Trinity Health-Michigan D/B/A St. Joseph Mercy Oakland
Case Number: 2:2019cv13777
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ashley E. Racette appearing on behalf of Trinity Health-Michigan D/B/A St. Joseph Mercy Oakland (Racette, Ashley)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Fred K. Herrmann appearing on behalf of Trinity Health-Michigan D/B/A St. Joseph Mercy Oakland (Herrmann, Fred)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Trinity Health-Michigan D/B/A St. Joseph Mercy Oakland waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Holtz, Ethan)
December 26, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Trinity Health-Michigan D/B/A St. Joseph Mercy Oakland* (BHan)
December 26, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400.00 by Silver Phoenix, LLC - Receipt No. DET127637 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 1/2/2020 (SKra)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Silver Phoenix, LLC against Trinity Health-Michigan D/B/A St. Joseph Mercy Oakland. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Lease and Amendment, #3 Exhibit B - Email) (Holtz, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver Phoenix, LLC v. Trinity Health-Michigan D/B/A St. Joseph Mercy Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Health-Michigan D/B/A St. Joseph Mercy Oakland
Represented By: Fred K. Herrmann
Represented By: Ashley E. Racette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Phoenix, LLC
Represented By: Ethan R. Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?