Hino Motors Manufacturing U.S.A. Inc. v. Boyer Consulting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hino Motors Manufacturing U.S.A. Inc.
Defendant: Boyer Consulting, LLC, Todd Shepley, Johnathon Boyer, Bruce Schroeder and Chris Hetman
Case Number: 2:2020cv10031
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT ORDER Granting Injunctive Relief and Ordering Production of Documents and Materials as to Defendant Chris Hetman. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants Shepley, Schroeder, Boyer and Boyer Consulting, LLC to Respond to #1 Complaint. Response due by 4/16/2020. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER Rescheduling Status Conference: Status Conference set for 3/26/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Rex appearing on behalf of Johnathon Boyer, Boyer Consulting, LLC (Rex, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert P. Geller appearing on behalf of Johnathon Boyer, Boyer Consulting, LLC (Geller, Robert)
February 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E. Reynolds on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Reynolds, Ronald)
February 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of Todd Shepley. (Allen, Matthew)
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L. Fitzgerald on behalf of Bruce Schroeder. (Fitzgerald, Erica)
February 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis M. Barnes on behalf of Bruce Schroeder. (Barnes, Dennis)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 2/24/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Chris Hetman served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FedEx Delivery Confirmation, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Honeycutt, James)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bruce Schroeder served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Honeycutt, James)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Roach on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Roach, James)
January 20, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Chris Hetman. (Kramer, David)
January 20, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Chris Hetman. (Kramer, David)
January 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Chris Hetman. (Kramer, David)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Hino Motors Manufacturing U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Requests) (Honeycutt, James)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Hino Motors Manufacturing U.S.A. Inc.. (Honeycutt, James)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
January 8, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Verification re #1 Complaint,,, by Hino Motors Manufacturing U.S.A. Inc. (Honeycutt, James)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hino Motors Manufacturing U.S.A. Inc. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7548814 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consulting Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email, #6 Exhibit 6 - Email, #7 Exhibit 7 - Email, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email, #9 Exhibit 9 - Email, #10 Exhibit 10 - Letter, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (Honeycutt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hino Motors Manufacturing U.S.A. Inc. v. Boyer Consulting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyer Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Geller
Represented By: Michael J. Rex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Shepley
Represented By: Matthew P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathon Boyer
Represented By: Robert P. Geller
Represented By: Michael J. Rex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Schroeder
Represented By: Dennis M. Barnes
Represented By: Erica L. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hetman
Represented By: David J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hino Motors Manufacturing U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: James M. Honeycutt
Represented By: Ronald E. Reynolds
Represented By: James E. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?