United States of America v. Dade et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Deerfield Village Community Association, Latoya Dade, Oakland County and Homeowners Assistance Nonprofit Housing Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv10110
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Latoya Dade. (Castmore, Joshua)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua C. Castmore appearing on behalf of Latoya Dade (Castmore, Joshua)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Deerfield Village Community Association served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Lizama, Thelma)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION REGARDING OAKLAND COUNTY'S INVOLVEMENT IN THE CASE by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Counsel for Oakland County's signature) (Lizama, Thelma)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Certificate of Service by Homeowners Assistance Nonprofit Housing Corporation. (Jurgensen, Andrew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Latoya Dade served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Lizama, Thelma)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Oakland County. (Buck, Brandon)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon K. Buck on behalf of Oakland County. (Buck, Brandon)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Homeowners Assistance Nonprofit Housing Corporation served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. (Lizama, Thelma)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III to District Judge David M. Lawson. (NAhm)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland County - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notices of Federal Tax Lien) (Lizama, Thelma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Dade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deerfield Village Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latoya Dade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeowners Assistance Nonprofit Housing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thelma Lizama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?