Hoskins v. Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc.
Plaintiff: Curtis Hoskins
Defendant: Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10244
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate conference call to 313-234-5175. *Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/28/2020* (BSau)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc. (Hamady, Biana)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc.. (Hamady, Biana)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Answer Deadline for Defendant. Answer due by 3/26/2020. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, Answer Deadline for Defendant by Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc. (Hamady, Biana) Modified on 3/9/2020 (BSau).
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Biana Hamady on behalf of Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc.. (Hamady, Biana)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking as Improperly Filed re #6 Stipulation filed by Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc. **PLEASE SEE R11 OF THE ECF POLICIES AND PROCEDURES MANUAL ON THE COURT'S WEBSITE FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS** Entered by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc. served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Pearlman, Arvin)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc.* (DAll)
January 31, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilensky on behalf of Curtis Hoskins. (Wilensky, Benjamin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Curtis Hoskins against Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7582456 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Shiawassee - County Where Action Arose: Shiawassee - County of 1st Defendant: Shiawassee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Pearlman, Arvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoskins v. Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Central Railroad, Inc.
Represented By: Biana Hamady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Hoskins
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilensky
Represented By: Arvin J. Pearlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?