ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation v. O'Brien Construction Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation
Defendant: O'Brien Construction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10312
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
2 Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration filed by O'Brien Construction Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Rockoff, Corinne)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin S. Frenkel on behalf of O'Brien Construction Company, Inc.. (Frenkel, Martin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Corinne S. Rockoff on behalf of O'Brien Construction Company, Inc.. (Rockoff, Corinne)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Hart on behalf of O'Brien Construction Company, Inc.. (Hart, David)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Kaatz on behalf of ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation. (Kaatz, Robert)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Setting Deadline for Defendant to File Response to Plaintiff's #1 Initiating Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration, ( Responsive Pleading due by 3/18/2020) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation waiver sent on 2/11/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Cardelli, Thomas)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge David M. Lawson to District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (NAhm)
February 11, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *O'Brien Construction Company, Inc.* (DAll)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation (Cardelli, Thomas)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Order to Compel Arbitration filed by ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation against O'Brien Construction Company, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7592464 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Collin County, TX - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Michigan, 2:19-cv-10657-GAD-MKM, Judge Gershwin Drain] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Dated: 3-27-2019, #2 Exhibit Email dated: 5-9-2019, #3 Exhibit Email dated: 7-10-2019) (Cardelli, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation v. O'Brien Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Brien Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Corinne S. Rockoff
Represented By: David E. Hart
Represented By: Martin S. Frenkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Thomas G. Cardelli
Represented By: Robert A. Kaatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?