Schwab Industries, Inc. v. Faraday&Future Inc.
Petitioner: Schwab Industries, Inc.
Respondent: Faraday&Future Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10437
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER TO CONFIRM CONSENT ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PETITIONER AND AGAINST RESPONDENT. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Order to Confirm Consent Arbitration Award and Enter Judgment in Favor of Petitioner and Against Respondent by Schwab Industries, Inc. (Zalewski, Paul)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Application re: Arbitration Award,, by Schwab Industries, Inc. (Zalewski, Paul)
February 21, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Faraday&Future Inc.* (DAll)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 Application re: Arbitration Award filed by Schwab Industries, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7608789 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Zalewski, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwab Industries, Inc. v. Faraday&Future Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Faraday&Future Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Schwab Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?